Military Commissions. Military Records.
Subject
Subject Source: Art & Architecture Thesaurus
Scope Note: Warrants conferring authority to raise and command a body of troops; certificates conferring military or naval rank and authority on officers of certain rank.
Found in 148 Collections and/or Records:
Commission appointing Robert Moubray Captain in the 80th Foot., 3 August 1799.
Item
Identifier: Ch.12990
Commission appointing Robert Moubray Ensign in the 80th Foot., 24 August 1795.
Item
Identifier: Ch.12988
Commission appointing Robert Moubray Lieutenant Colonel in the Sicilian regiment., 4 June 1813.
Item
Identifier: Ch.12992
Commission appointing Robert Moubray Lieutenant in the 80th Foot., 2 February 1796.
Item
Identifier: Ch.12989
Dates:
2 February 1796.
Commission appointing Robert Moubray Lieutenant in the Royal Fifeshire Yeomanry Cavalry., 14 June 1820.
Item
Identifier: Ch.12993
Scope and Contents
Signed by the Earl of Morton.
Dates:
14 June 1820.
Commission appointing Robert Moubray Major in the Sicilian regiment., 12 January 1809.
Item
Identifier: Ch.12991
Dates:
12 January 1809.
Commission appointing W K Burton [father of J H Burton] lieutenant in the 4th Garrison Battalion., 1809.
Item
Identifier: Ch.8494
Commission appointing W K Burton [father of J H Burton] Lieutenant in the 94th Regiment of Foot., 1807.
Item
Identifier: Ch.8493
Commission as Lieutenant in the Volunteer Force., 1903.
Item
Identifier: Ch.17418
Commission by George, Duke of Buckingham to Sir Henry Bruce as captain of one hundred men and colonel of a regiment., 13 August 1625.
Item
Identifier: Ch.14896
Commission by the 7th Marquess of Tweeddale to Charles Howden of Athelstaneford to be a Lieutenant in the Militia., 1798.
Item
Identifier: Ch.10967
Commission by the Duke of Hamilton and the Privy Council to Archibald, Earl of Argyll and in his absence John, Earl of Glencairn as Commander in Chief and to Alexander, Lord Eglinton as Commander of Horse., 5 July 1689.
Item
Identifier: Ch.14915
Commission by the Earl of Caithness, Lord Lieutenant of Caithness, in favour of George Innes as Lieutenant in the 1st Battalion of the Caithness Volunteers., 1803.
Item
Identifier: MS.98, folio 57
Dates:
1803.
Commission by William, Earl Marischal (succeeded 1623) for offering his ships of war to the King of Poland and Sweden., 31 March 1634.
Item
Identifier: Ch.17311
Dates:
31 March 1634.
Commission in favour of Sir Patrick Keith Murray, 8th Baronet, of Ochtertyre, to be Captain in the Perthshire Rifle Volunteers., 3 October 1861.
Item
Identifier: Ch.17073
Dates:
3 October 1861.
Commission in favour of Sir Patrick Keith Murray, 8th Baronet, of Ochtertyre, to be Ensign and Lieutenant in the 1st Regiment of Foot Guards., 9 February 1855.
Item
Identifier: Ch.17071
Dates:
9 February 1855.
Commission in favour of Sir Patrick Keith Murray, 8th Baronet, of Ochtertyre, to be Lieutenant and Captain in the 1st Regiment of Foot Guards., 15 September 1857.
Item
Identifier: Ch.17072
Dates:
15 September 1857.
Commission in favour of Sir Patrick Murray, 4th Baronet, of Ochtertyre, as Brigadier in the Royal Company of Archers., 5 July 1742.
Item
Identifier: Ch.17047
Scope and Contents
This document is fully dated Edinburgh, 5 July 1742.
Dates:
5 July 1742.
Commission in favour of Sir Patrick Murray, 4th Baronet, of Ochtertyre as Captain in Lord Sempill`s Highland Regiment of Foot., 25 December 1744.
Item
Identifier: Ch.17048
Dates:
25 December 1744.
Commission in favour of Sir Patrick Murray, 6th Baronet, of Ochtertyre as Captain in the 2nd Regiment Royal Edinburgh Volunteers., 25 February 1797.
Item
Identifier: Ch.17055
Dates:
25 February 1797.
Commission in favour of Sir Patrick Murray, 6th Baronet, of Ochtertyre as Lieutenant-Colonel, 1st Battalion of the Royal Perthshire Volunteers., 24 August 1804.
Item
Identifier: Ch.17060
Dates:
24 August 1804.
Commission in favour of Sir Patrick Murray, 6th Baronet, of Ochtertyre to be Lieutenant-Colonel in the Royal Perthshire Militia., 25 September 1808.
Item
Identifier: Ch.17062
Dates:
25 September 1808.
Commission in favour of Sir William Keith Murray, 7th Baronet, of Ochtertyre, to be Captain in the Perthshire Volunteers., 5 May 1860.
Item
Identifier: Ch.17069
Dates:
5 May 1860.
Commission in favour of Sir William Keith Murray, 7th Baronet, of Ochtertyre, to be Lieutenant-Colonel in the Perthshire Volunteers., 20 November 1860.
Item
Identifier: Ch.17070
Dates:
20 November 1860.
Commission in favour of Sir William Murray, 5th Baronet, of Ochtertyre as Ensign the Coldstream Guards., 4 May 1767.
Item
Identifier: Ch.17049
Dates:
4 May 1767.