Instruments of resignation. Legal Instruments.
Subject
Subject Source: Other Source
Scope Note: Scots Law. Transmission of heritable rights. Notarial instruments drawn up and attested by the notary and witnesses recording the transmission of property. Source: Bell, William. 'Dictionary and digest of the law of Scotland'.
Found in 136 Collections and/or Records:
Resignation by Alexander, 2nd Earl of Linlithgow, of all his lands to the crown., 1640.
Item
Identifier: Ch.8603
Resignation by Isobel Forbes, wife of David Low, burgess, Aberdeen, in favour of George, Earl Marischal (succeeded 1581), of land at Castlegate, Aberdeen., 12 August 1597.
Item
Identifier: Ch.17197
Dates:
12 August 1597.
Found in:
National Library of Scotland Archives and Manuscripts Division
/
Charters and formal documents from the Murray of Ochtertyre and Keith, Earl Marischal papers.
/
Charters and formal documents from the Keith, Earl Marischal papers.
/
Titles of the Keiths, Earls Marischal for their property in Kincardineshire and Aberdeenshire and elsewhere in Scotland.
Resignation by John Keith of Ravenscraig in favour of Alexander Keith of Over Dysart of Ravenscraig Castle and Torteston., 8 February 1601.
Item
Identifier: Ch.17205
Dates:
8 February 1601.
Found in:
National Library of Scotland Archives and Manuscripts Division
/
Charters and formal documents from the Murray of Ochtertyre and Keith, Earl Marischal papers.
/
Charters and formal documents from the Keith, Earl Marischal papers.
/
Titles of the Keiths, Earls Marischal for their property in Kincardineshire and Aberdeenshire and elsewhere in Scotland.
Resignation by Laurence Oliphant, son of deceased Patrick Oliphant of Over Turings to John Stirling of Easter Brackie of Over Turings., 30 January 1627.
Item
Identifier: Ch.14260
Resignation by Mr John Wardlaw, son of deceased John Wardlaw, burgess of Edinburgh, to John, Lord Saltoun of Easter Saltoun., 1 June 1610.
Item
Identifier: Ch.13195
Dates:
1 June 1610.
Resignation by William Barrie in Mekil Colbb and Elizabeth Scott his wife to John Ogilvy of Colyern, of Mekil Colbb., 11 September 1605.
Item
Identifier: Ch.15099
Resignation of Thomas Hay, Archpriest of Dunbar., 1554.
Item
Identifier: Ch.10720
Resignation of William Robiesoun, burgess of Selkirk, in favour of Robert Scott of Haining (Hayning)., ?3 November 1576.
Item
Identifier: Ch.7617
Dates:
?3 November 1576.
Titledeeds of the lands of East Barns, alias Grange, in Dunfermline., 1566-1806.
Series
Identifier: Ch.12913-12947
Scope and Contents
Four of these are signed by James VI and Anne of Denmark.
Dates:
1566-1806.
Titledeeds of the lands of Touch in Dunfermline., 1566-1652.
Series
Identifier: Ch.12948-12955
Titledeeds of various lands in Inverkeithing., 1591-1729.
Series
Identifier: Ch.12957-12970