Certificates
Subject
Subject Source: Unspecified ingested source
Found in 131 Collections and/or Records:
Certificate of admission as an external member of the Medico-Chirurgical Society, Edinburgh., 3 April 1878.
Item
Identifier: Ch.15509
Dates:
3 April 1878.
Certificate of admission as an honorary member to the Royal Irish Academy, awarded to George Combe, phrenologist., 1835.
Item
Identifier: Ch.7607
Certificate of admission as an honorary member to the Société Phrénologique de Paris, awarded to George Combe, phrenologist., 1831.
Item
Identifier: Ch.7603
Certificate of admission as correspondent to the Academy of Natural Science, Philadelphia, awarded to George Combe, phrenologist., 1838.
Item
Identifier: Ch.7609
Certificate of admission to the Royal Company of Archers in favour of Matthew Rennie., 7 September 1825.
Item
Identifier: Ch.15434
Dates:
7 September 1825.
Certificate of admission, with royal warrant, of Alexander MacLachlan, writer in Edinburgh, as a Notary Public.
Series
Identifier: Ch.B.2344-2345
Dates:
1776.
Certificate of appointment as administrator of estate of George Ellice, deceased, issued to Edward Ellice., 17 September 1810.
Item
Identifier: Ch.12714
Certificate of appointment as chief inspector of mines., 1897.
Item
Identifier: Ch.17416
Certificate of appointment of David Cormack as Keeper of the Minute Book of the Court of Session., 1847.
Item
Identifier: Ch.8970
Certificate of election as a corresponding member of the Academy of Natural Sciences of Philadelphia., 25 March 1884.
Item
Identifier: Ch.15510
Dates:
25 March 1884.
Certificate of election as a foreign corresponding member of the Académie Royale de Médecine de Belgique., 30 July 1898.
Item
Identifier: Ch.15512
Dates:
30 July 1898.
Certificate of election as a member of the Royal Society of Edinburgh., 7 July 1884.
Item
Identifier: Ch.15511
Dates:
7 July 1884.
Certificate of election as an honorary fellow of the National Institute of Sciences of India., 1 January 1953.
Item
Identifier: Ch.15524
Dates:
1 January 1953.
Certificate of election of Robert Liston as a member of the Society of the Sons of St George, Philadelphia., 1797.
Item
Identifier: Ch.5789
Certificate of enrolment of Jeanette Brown in the 24th Glasgow Girl Guides.
Item
Identifier: Acc.12898
Dates:
1920.
Certificate of long service, to George Drummond Graeme., 1837.
Item
Identifier: Ch.15439AB
Certificate of Louis Antoine, Duc d`Angoulême, conferring the Croix de l`Ordre Royal et Militaire de Saint-Louis on General Jean Gérard Bonnaire., 1815.
Item
Identifier: Ch.7701
Dates:
1815.
Certificate of Louis de Lorraine, Comte d`Armagnac, Master of the Horse, appointing François Joseph de MacKan colleague and successor to his father, François Guillaume de MacKan, Master of the Riding Academy at Strasbourg., 1713.
Item
Identifier: Ch.7699
Dates:
1713.
Certificate of membership of the Corporation of the Orphan Hospital, Edinburgh., 1892.
Item
Identifier: Ch.11020
Certificate of membership of the Railway Clerks Association in the Scottish Trades Union Congress.
Item
Identifier: Acc.7661
Dates:
1922.
Certificate of naturalization as a subject of the Holy Roman Empire given to John Mackenzie.
Item
Identifier: Ch.5757
Dates:
1779.
Certificate of ordination of James Ellice., 5 September 1814.
Item
Identifier: Ch.12724
Certificate of ordination of James Radford of Exeter College, Oxford as Deacon, given by William, Bishop of Exeter., 1794.
Item
Identifier: Ch.10655
Dates:
1794.
Certificate of recommendation in favour of Alexander Caruthers as a Master Mason., 1776.
Item
Identifier: Ch.10652
Dates:
1776.
Certificate of service by Henry Fletcher as midshipman on H.M.S. Experiment., 27 October 1748.
Item
Identifier: Ch.14733